SC H4003 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "produce Safety Act", To Establish The Authority Of The South Carolina Department Of Agriculture To Enforce Certain Food Safety Standards Applicable To Farm Produce Including, But Not Limited To, The Authority To Inspect Certain Farms; To Seize, Condemn, And Destroy Covered Produce; And To Obtain A Court Order For Forfeiture And Destruction Of Covered Produce; To Provide For The Appeal Of Court Orders; To Define Certain Terms, Including "farm" And "covered Produce"; To Provide Exceptions For Certain Farms And Produce; To Authorize The Department To Promulgate Regulations; To Establish Certain Penalties For Violation Of The Chapter; To Provide For The Repeal Of The Chapter Under Certain Circumstances; And For Other Purposes
Title
Produce Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Davey Hiott [R] | Rep. William Hewitt [R] | Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] | Rep. Cally Forrest [R] |
Rep. Linda Bennett [R] | Rep. John West [R] | Rep. Russell Ott [D] | Rep. Frank Atkinson [D] |
Rep. William Hixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 92 | |
2017-05-30 | Effective date 05/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 118 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-11 |
2017-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-28 | House | Amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt, Davis, Forrest, Bennett, West, Ott, Atkinson |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |