SC H3999 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide The Signage Prohibits Both Permit Holders And Non-permit Holders From Carrying A Weapon Onto The Premise; And To Repeal Sections 16-23-460, 23-31-225, And 23-31-230 Relating To Unlawfully Carrying A Concealed Deadly Weapon, And Carrying A Concealable Weapon From A Motor Vehicle To Certain Rental Dwellings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Constitutional Carry Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: White
2019-05-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2019-04-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2019-04-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
2019-03-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
2019-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Crawford, Hiott, Hardee
2019-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Kimmons
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill, Davis, Gagnon
2019-02-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor, Murphy, McCravy, Thayer, West
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0139 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0400 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3456 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011320(n/a)See Bill Text
162320(n/a)See Bill Text
1623420(n/a)See Bill Text
1623430(n/a)See Bill Text
1623460(n/a)See Bill Text
1623465(n/a)See Bill Text
162350(n/a)See Bill Text
2331215(n/a)See Bill Text
2331220(n/a)See Bill Text
2331225(n/a)See Bill Text
2331230(n/a)See Bill Text
2331235(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback