SC H3987 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-7-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Abbeville County, So As To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office. - Ratified Title
Title
Abbeville County voting precincts
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] | Rep. John West [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Act No. 12 | |
2019-03-27 | Effective date 03/20/19 | |
2019-03-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Ratified R 21 | |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-02-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |