SC H3982 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Murphy
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Murphy
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 38-75-1000, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Commissions Paid By A Title Insurer, So As To Remove The Cap On The Commission.
Title
Cap on title insurance commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Murphy |
2021-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0539 (Similar To) 2021-02-09 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3982&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3982_20210225.htm |