SC H3979 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-16)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Rose
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 27-30-135 So As To Render A Deed Restriction, Covenant, Or A Homeowners Association Document Intended To Prohibit The Installation Of A Solar Energy System Void And Unenforceable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOA - Solar Panels

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Rose
2021-03-23HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: S.Williams, Rivers
2021-03-16HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Haddon
2021-03-11HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Hyde, Forrest
2021-03-09HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Magnuson, Long
2021-03-03HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Tedder
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Nutt, Allison
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2730135(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback