SC H3968 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Include Certain Prior Criminal Convictions Or Pleas To Criminal Conduct; And To Provide That The Provisions Of This Act Take Effect Two Years After Approval By The Governor.
Title
Prior criminal conviction effects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-3 |
2017-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-28 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |