SC H3957 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Act No. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Act No. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 50-5-1705 And 50-5-1710, Both As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Catch And Size Limits For The Taking, Possessing, Landing, Selling, Or Purchasing Of Certain Fish From The State's Waters, So As To Decrease The Catch Limit And Increase The Size Limit For Flounder; To Amend Section 50-9-540, Relating To Recreational Saltwater Fishing Licenses And Charter Fishing Vessels, So As To Increase Certain Fees And To Create And Eliminate Certain Licenses; To Amend Section 50-9-920, As Amended, Relating To Revenues Generated By Certain Licenses, So As To Require That A Portion Be Used For The Development And Implementation Of A Flounder Stocking Program; And To Require The Department Of Natural Resources Provide A Report On South Carolina's Stock Of Flounder. - Ratified Title
Title
Flounder- catch size and limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Act No. 91 | |
2021-06-22 | Effective date 07/01/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-06-09 | Ratified R 111 | |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2021-06-08 | House | Free conference report adopted |
2021-06-08 | House | Free conference committee appointed Lowe, Hewitt, Pendarvis |
2021-06-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-1 |
2021-06-08 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Free conference report received and adopted |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Free conference committee appointed Campsen, Goldfinch, McElveen |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Campsen, Goldfinch, McElveen |
2021-05-13 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Lowe, Hewitt, Pendarvis |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2021-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-4 |
2021-05-12 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-1 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-3 |
2021-03-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-16 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 5 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 5 | 1710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 9 | 540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
50 | 9 | 920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |