SC H3956 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-1-320 So As To Establish The "south Carolina Rare Disease Advisory Council" Within The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, To Provide For The Purpose, Duties, Membership, And Funding Of The Council, To Establish Certain Reporting And Meeting Requirements, And For Other Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rare Disease Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-04-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-04-21HouseRoll call Yeas-63 Nays-45
2021-04-21HouseRead second time
2021-04-15HouseCommittee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-02-23HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
441320(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback