SC H3936 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-104-20, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Eligibility For Palmetto Fellows Scholarships, So As To Include Two-year Institutions Of Higher Learning And Technical Colleges Among Institutions Of Higher Learning Whose Students May Be Eligible For The Scholarships.
Title
Palmetto Fellows Scholarship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-2 |
2019-04-03 | House | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brown |
2019-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams |
2019-03-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-21-19 |
2019-03-19 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2019-03-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2019-02-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen |
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis |
2019-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Chellis |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |