SC H3920 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Member
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Member
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 1, Title 1, So As To Enact The "personhood Act Of South Carolina", To Establish That The Right To Life For Each Born And Preborn Human Being Vests At Fertilization And That The Rights Of Due Process And Equal Protection, Guaranteed By Section 3, Article I Of The Constitution Of This State, Vests At Fertilization For Each Born And Preborn Human Being.
Title
Personhood Act of SC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Member |
2019-05-02 | House | Member |
2019-03-28 | House | Member |
2019-03-20 | House | Member |
2019-03-12 | House | Member |
2019-03-05 | House | Member |
2019-02-26 | House | Member |
2019-02-19 | House | Member |
2019-02-14 | House | Member |
2019-02-12 | House | Member |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0485 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3289 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
H3289 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3920&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3920_20190207.htm |