SC H3916 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-37-2615, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Penalties For Failure To Register A Motor Vehicle, So As To Provide That A Person Who Fails To Register A Motor Vehicle Is Guilty Of A Misdemeanor And, Upon Conviction, Must Be Fined Not More Than Five Hundred Dollars Or Imprisoned For A Period Not To Exceed Thirty Days, Or Both. - Ratified Title
Title
Vehicle registration
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Murphy [R] | Rep. Con Chellis [R] | Rep. Mandy Kimmons [R] | Rep. Gary Simrill [R] |
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 1a (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 69 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/19 | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 89 | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2019-02-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-67 Nays-36 |
2019-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0162 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary