SC H3915 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 63-7-10 And 63-7-1620, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Principles Of The State's Child Welfare System And Legal Representation Of The Department Of Social Services In Child Abuse And Neglect Proceedings, Respectively, So As To Clarify That Legal Representatives Of The Department Must Ensure That Child Welfare And Safety Are The Sole Basis Of Department Recommendations And Decisions In Such Proceedings And That The Legal Representatives Have The Sole Discretion On Behalf Of The Department Over Any Decisions Pertaining To Such Proceedings.
Title
Child welfare system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-05-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-7 |
2019-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, S.Williams, Bannister |
2019-04-30 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Henegan, Norrell |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott, Weeks |
2019-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2019-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2019-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |