SC H3899 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3790, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Exceptional Needs Child Tax Credit, So As To Increase The Amount The Public Charity May Expend For Administration Costs To Five Percent, To Allow The Fund And Individuals To Carry Forward Credits And Increase The Amount A Taxpayer May Claim As A Percentage Of Tax Liability, To Remove A Provision That Requires A School To Provide Certain Individual Student Test Scores In Its Application, And To Increase The Credit Authorization Amounts Among Credits So Long As The Total Authorization Amount Is Not Exceeded. - Ratified Title
Title
Exceptional needs tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 79 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 95 | |
2021-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-1 |
2021-05-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2021-04-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-1 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-07 | House | Amended |
2021-04-06 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2021-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, McGarry, Fry |
2021-03-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2021-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |