SC H3878 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "child Welfare Providers Protection Act" By Adding Chapter 10 To Title 63 So As To Protect Persons Who Provide Adoption Or Foster Care Services From Governmental Discriminatory Actions Taken Against Such Persons For Services Provided Or Declined Based Upon Or In A Manner Consistent With A Sincerely Held Religious Belief Or Moral Conviction; To Define Terms; To Create Legal Remedies For Violation Of The Chapter; And For Other Purposes.
Title
Child welfare provider protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford |
2021-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry |
2021-02-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, Pope, Erickson, Bradley, Herbkersman, W.Newton, Daning, Taylor, Haddon, Magnuson |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3878&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3878_20210211.htm |