SC H3872 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committed to Committee on Education SJ-21
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committed to Committee on Education SJ-21
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING ARTICLE 26 TO CHAPTER 53, TITLE 59 SO AS TO ENACT THE "GREENVILLE TECHNICAL COLLEGE ENTERPRISE CAMPUS AUTHORITY ACT", AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE POWERS AND DUTIES OF THE GREENVILLE TECHNICAL COLLEGE ENTERPRISE CAMPUS AUTHORITY.
Title
Enact The "greenville Technical College Enterprise Campus Authority Act", And To Provide For The Powers And Duties Of The Greenville Technical College Enterprise Campus Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Committed to Committee on Education SJ-21 | |
2009-04-28 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference SJ-9 | |
2009-04-23 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-237 | |
2009-04-22 | Read second time HJ-26 | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-30 |
Same As/Similar To
S0614 (Similar To) 2009-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Education SJ-4
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3872&session=118 |