SC H3865 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 50-21-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Watercraft Laws And Ordinances, So As To Prohibit A Local Government From Adopting An Ordinance Relating To Watercraft Or Water Devices Used Or Held For Use On The Waters Of This State And To Provide Exceptions. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Watercraft Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Act No. 77
2021-06-01 Effective date 07/01/21
2021-05-17 Signed By Governor
2021-05-13 Ratified R 93
2021-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
2021-05-12HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2021-05-12SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2021-05-11SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2021-05-11SenateRead second time
2021-05-06SenateAmended
2021-05-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-05-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry
2021-03-17SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2021-03-17SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-03-17HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-03-16HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-4
2021-03-16HouseRead second time
2021-03-16HouseAmended
2021-03-11HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
502130(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback