SC H3862 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require That In Addition To Current Screening Requirements Regarding Retired Judges And Justices Provided By Chapter 19, Title 2, Retired Judges And Justices Assigned By The Chief Justice To Preside Over Any Proceeding Before A Circuit Or Family Court Or To Act As An Associate Justice In A Proceeding Before The Supreme Court Or Court Of Appeals Also Must Be Confirmed Every Two Years By The General Assembly In Joint Session Beginning January 1, 2016.
Title
Judges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2015-05-26 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-26 | House | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hart |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |