SC H3808 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Cancer Patients, Survivors And Their Families, To Remember Those People Who Have Been Lost To Cancer, And To Declare Tuesday, March 7, 2017, As "suits And Sneakers Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Suits and Sneakers Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Polled out of committee Invitations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Invitations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3808&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3808_20170221.htm |