SC H3788 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 1-7-920, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Membership Of The Commission On Prosecution Coordination, So As To Add The Attorney General For The Term For Which He Is Elected Or His Designee To The Membership Of The Commission.
Title
Prosecution Coordination Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Malloy, Senn, Adams, Garrett |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |