SC H3731 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-75-5, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Section 40-75-10, As Amended, Section 40-75-20, As Amended, Section 40-75-30, As Amended, Section 40-75-110, As Amended, Section 40-75-190, As Amended, Section 40-75-200, Section 40-75-220, As Amended, Section 40-75-250, As Amended, Section 40-75-260, As Amended, Section 40-75-285, As Amended, All Relating To The Regulation Of Licensed Professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists, Addiction Counselors, And Psycho-educational Specialists, So As To Provide For The Regulation Of Behavior Analysts And Assistant Behavior Analysts, And To Make Miscellaneous And Conforming Changes; To Redesignate Chapter 75, Title 40 As "professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists, Behavior Analysts, And Licensed Psycho-educational Specialists", And To Redesignate Article 1, Chapter 75, Title 40 As "professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists, Behavior Analysts, And Licensed Psycho-educational Specialists".
Title
Counselors, therapists and psychologists, licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope |
2021-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter, M.M.Smith |
2021-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hyde |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0630 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 75 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 190 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 285 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 75 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |