SC H3730 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Act No. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Act No. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 56-5-2710, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To A Driver Of A Motor Vehicle Obeying A Signal That Indicates An Approaching Train, So As To Provide Additional Circumstances That Require A Driver To Stop A Vehicle Approaching Railroad Grade Crossings. - Ratified Title
Title
Train signals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 27 N: 74 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Table Amendment 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 27 N: 74 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Act No. 132 | |
2022-04-15 | Effective date 04/11/22 | |
2022-04-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-04-07 | Ratified R 142 | |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-28 | House | Amended |
2021-04-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Murray |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |