SC H3728 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-130-80 So As To Require Health Care Facilities To Submit Certain Information To The Department Of Health And Environmental Control (dhec) For Inclusion In The Prescription Monitoring Program When A Person Is Administered An Opioid Antidote; To Amend Section 44-130-60, Relating To The Authority Of First Responders To Administer Opioid Antidotes, So As To Require First Responders To Submit Certain Information To Dhec For Inclusion In The Prescription Monitoring Program; To Amend Section 44-53-1640, Relating To The Prescription Monitoring Program, So As To Require The Program To Monitor The Administering Of Opioid Antidotes By First Responders And In Emergency Health Care Settings; To Amend Section 44-53-1645, Relating To The Requirement Of Practitioners To Review A Patient's Controlled Substance Prescription History Before Prescribing A Schedule Ii Controlled Substance, So As To Also Require A Review Of Any Incidents In Which The Patient Has Been Administered An Opioid Antidote By A First Responder Or In An Emergency Health Care Setting; And To Amend Section 44-53-360, As Amended, Relating To Prescriptions, So As To Provide For The Use Of Electronic Prescriptions. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription monitoring program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 65
2019-05-31 Effective date 01/01/21
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 85
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
2019-05-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-05-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-02SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2019-04-09HouseRead second time
2019-04-09HouseAmended
2019-04-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, B.Newton
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams
2019-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, Cogswell, Gilliard, Mack
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4413060(n/a)See Bill Text
4413080(n/a)See Bill Text
44531640(n/a)See Bill Text
44531645(n/a)See Bill Text
4453360(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3728&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3728_20190123.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3728_20190404.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3728_20190409.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3728_20190502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3728_20190503.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3728_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3728_20190509.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16312
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16737
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16850

Bill Comments

feedback