SC H3699 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 48-39-145, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Application Fees For Permits To Alter Critical Areas, So As To Authorize The South Carolina Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Defer To The United States Army Corps Of Engineers In Determining The Size Of A Private Recreational Dock Constructed On The Atlantic Intracoastal Waterway Federal Navigation Project. - Ratified Title
Title
Critical area altering, permits and fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Act No. 29 | |
2019-05-16 | Effective date 05/13/19 | |
2019-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Ratified R 59 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-1 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-20 | House | Amended |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0371 (Similar To) 2019-01-15 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources