SC H3681 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Magnuson
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide A Citation, To State The Purpose Of The Chapter, To Provide Necessary Definitions, To Provide For The Establishment And Funding Of Accounts For Use In Meeting Certain Education Expenses Of Eligible Students, To Provide Guidelines For The Use Of Such Funds And Penalties For Misuse, To Provide Certain Related Powers And Duties Of The Education Oversight Committee, And To Create A Parental Review Panel To Assist In Determining Whether Certain Expenses Constitute Qualified Education Expenses, Among Other Things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Account Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Magnuson
2019-04-30HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Sottile, Weeks, McCoy, Tallon
2019-03-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Lucas
2019-03-21HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Cogswell
2019-03-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Simrill
2019-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Spires, West, D.C.Moss
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Bernstein, Brawley
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford, Ballentine, Herbkersman, W.Newton
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy, Cogswell, Hixon
2019-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0523 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0556 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Committee on Education

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback