SC H3669 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-37-610, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Persons Liable For Taxes And Assessments On Real Property, So As To Provide That Certain Disabled Veterans Of The Armed Forces Of The United States Are Exempt From Property Taxes In The Year In Which The Disability Occurs.
Title
Property tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, McDaniel, King, Rivers |
2022-04-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-04-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Wooten, B.Cox, Gilliam, Hosey, Clyburn, Bailey, J.E.Johnson, W.Cox, White |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2021-04-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2021-04-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |