SC H3664 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 40-57-115, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Criminal Background Checks Required For Initial Licensure By The Real Estate Commission, So As To Require Social Security Number-based Criminal Records Checks In Addition To Existing Requirements. - Ratified Title
Title
Criminal background checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Act No. 25 | |
2021-04-28 | Effective date 04/26/21 | |
2021-04-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-22 | Ratified R 37 | |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton |
2021-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley, Murray |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-02-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby, B.Cox, Anderson |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |