SC H3663 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Make Application By The State Of South Carolina Under Article V Of The United States Constitution For A Convention Of The States To Be Called, Restricted To Proposing An Amendment To The United States Constitution To Set A Limit On The Number Of Terms That A Person May Be Elected As A Member Of The United States House Of Representatives And To Set A Limit On The Number Of Terms That A Person May Be Elected As A Member Of The United States Senate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Set term limits for the US House and US Senate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
2021-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry, Huggins
2021-02-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Dabney, B.Cox, B.Newton, Morgan
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Oremus, West
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback