SC H3656 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 57-1-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Functions And Purposes Of The Department Of Transportation, So As To Provide That The Department Shall Implement A "complete Streets" Policy To Provide Safe And Efficient Accommodations For Pedestrians, Cyclists, And Transit Riders.
Title
DOT, functions and purposes
Sponsors
Rep. Marvin Pendarvis [D] | Rep. JA Moore [D] | Rep. Shedron Williams [D] | Rep. Kambrell Garvin [D] |
Rep. William Cogswell [R] | Rep. Seth Rose [D] | Rep. Beth Bernstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein |
2019-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Felder |
2019-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2019-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2019-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3656&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3656_20190117.htm |