SC H3632 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones, Elliott
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That It Is Unlawful To Deface, Vandalize, Injure, Or Remove A Historical Monument Or Historical Marker On Public Property, To Provide Penalties, To Provide Procedures For Correction To The Public Property, And To Provide For The Recovery Of Certain Costs Associated With The Corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human remains, desecration or destruction of

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones, Elliott
2019-03-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
2019-02-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, Taylor
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon, Pope, Bryant, D.C.Moss, Daning, Hiott, Martin, Sottile, Gagnon, Yow
2019-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Young, White
2019-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee, G.R.Smith
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Toole
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill, Whitmire
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy, Trantham, Willis, Chumley
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0513 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1617600(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback