SC H3622 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 2-17-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Definitions Of "lobbying", "lobbyist", "public Body", "public Employee", And "public Official", So As To Provide That "lobbying" And "lobbyist" Also Mean Any Person Who Is Employed, Appointed, Or Retained, With Or Without Compensation, By Another Person To Influence Certain Official Actions By Direct Communication With Public Officials Or Public Employees, The Action Or Vote Of Any Member Of A County Or Municipal Governing Body, The Vote Of Any Public Official Or Public Member Of Any County Or Municipal Agency, Board, Or Commission, Or The Official Action Or Vote Of Any County Or Municipal Chief Executive Official Or Employee, Including Mayors And County Or Municipal Administrators Or Managers, And To Provide That "public Body", "public Employee", And "public Official" Also Mean County Or Municipal Bodies, Employees, And Officials.
Title
Lobbying definitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon, Hewitt |
2019-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rutherford, Bailey, Allison, Davis, Kimmons |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Spires, W.Cox, Ballentine, Mace, Clary, Pope, Finlay, Wooten, Caskey, R.Williams, B.Cox, Brawley, Funderburk, Pendarvis, Bannister, Kirby, Collins, Bryant, West, Stavrinakis, Hyde, Magnuson, Tallon, Chellis, Garvin, Bernstein, Huggins, Simrill, Ott, McDaniel, Moore, King, Simmons, Bales, Brown, Weeks, Bamberg, Elliott, Daning, Cobb-Hunter, Atkinson, Bradley, Morgan, Wheeler, S.Williams, Norrell, Clemmons, Chumley, Ligon, Hart |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3622&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3622_20190116.htm |