SC H3615 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Definitions For The Terms "bicycles With Helper Motors", "electric-assist Bicycles", And "personal Mobility Device".
Title
Dylan Paul Mitchell Bicycle and Pedestrian Safety Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-19 | House | Amended |
2017-04-18 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-04-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-18-17 |
2017-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, Brown |
2017-03-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2017-03-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott |
2017-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2017-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein |
2017-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, Duckworth, G.R.Smith, Williams, Jefferson, Felder |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 3520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 990 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |