SC H3595 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Driver Of A Motor Vehicle Approaching A Vehicle Collecting Solid Waste Or Recovered Materials, As Provided In Section 56-5-2510, Must Proceed With Caution And, If Possible, Yield The Right Of Way By Making A Lane Change Into A Lane That Is Not Adjacent To The Vehicle Collecting Solid Waste Or Recovered Materials, And To Provide A Penalty.
Title
Motor vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. Kevin Hardee [R] | Rep. Mike Ryhal [R] | Rep. William Hewitt [R] |
Rep. Gary Clary [R] | Rep. Davey Hiott [R] | Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Ronald Young [R] | Rep. Jimmy Bales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-03-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-6-18 |
2018-02-21 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales |
2018-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2018-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor, Hixon, Young |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and read first time |