SC H3589 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-19-350, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Establishment Of Schools Of Choice Exempt From Certain Statutes And Regulations, So As To Redesignate These Schools As Being Schools Of Innovation, To Clarify That Public School Districts May Establish Multiple Schools Of Innovation, And To Provide Procedures For Obtaining And Renewing Status As A School Of Innovation. - Ratified Title
Title
School of choice
Sponsors
Rep. Merita Allison [R] | Rep. James Lucas [R] | Rep. Marvin Smith [R] | Rep. Paula Rawl Calhoon [R] |
Rep. Raye Felder [R] | Rep. Chip Huggins [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Table Amendment 1 Amendment Number 1 (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Act No. 20 | |
2021-04-26 | Effective date 04/22/21 | |
2021-04-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-22 | Ratified R 36 | |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-21 |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Setzler, Hembree, Rice |
2021-04-06 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Allison, Felder, Alexander |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-45 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2021-03-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-03-17 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2021-03-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-16-21 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-02-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-32 |
2021-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Amended |
2021-02-02 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2021-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2021-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon, Felder |
2021-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |