SC H3586 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 23-47-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Certain Terms And Their Definitions Regarding The Public Safety Communications Center, So As To Provide Additional Terms And Their Definitions; To Amend Section 23-47-20, Relating To Requirements That Pertain To A 911 System, So As To Provide That The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office Is Responsible For Creating And Updating A Comprehensive Strategic 911 And Nextgen 9-1-1 (ng9-1-1) System, And To Revise The Standards That Govern The Operation Of 911 And Ng9-1-1 Systems; To Amend Section 23-47-40, Relating To 911 Charges That May Be Imposed Upon Each Local Exchange Access Facility Subscribed To By Telephone Subscribers Whose Local Exchange Access Lines Are In The Area Served Or Which Would Be Served By The 911 Service, So As To Revise The List Of Items That May Be Funded With These Charges; To Amend Section 23-47-50, Relating To Subscriber Billing For The Provision Of 911 Service, So As To Make Technical Changes, To Provide That The "emergency Telephone System" Fund Must Be Included In The Annual Audit Of The Local Government, To Provide That Upon The Finding Of Inappropriate Use Of 911 Funds Pursuant To An Audit, The Local Government Must Restore Those Funds Within Ninety Days, To Provide That The Local Government Must Provide The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office A Copy Of The Audited Report, To Provide That Funds May Be Withheld From A Local Government That Fails To Comply With The Audit Provisions, And To Revise The Purpose For Levying A Cmrs 911 Charge; To Amend Section 23-47-60, Relating To A Local Government Providing Standard Addresses For Their Residents Before Enhanced 911 Is Placed In Service, So As To Provide That The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office Shall Designate One Office Within Each County As The Addressing Official; To Amend Section 23-47-65, As Amended, Relating To The Creation And Responsibilities Of The South Carolina 911 Advisory Committee, So As To Increase Its Responsibilities, To Increase The Size Of Its Membership, To Revise The Process Of Appointing Members, To Provide Its Members Compensation For Certain Expenses, To Increase And Revise The Responsibilities Of The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office And To Make Technical Changes; To Amend Section 23-47-75, Relating To Certain 911 Information That Is Not Subject To The Freedom Of Information Act Or Disclosure, So As To Provide A Local Government May Exempt Certain Information From Disclosure And To Define The Term "identifying Information"; And To Amend Section 23-47-80, Relating To Penalties Associated With Unlawfully Placing A 911 Call, So As Make Technical Changes. - Ratified Title
Title
Public Safety Communications Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 60 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/19 | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 80 | |
2019-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2019-05-09 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Massey, Sabb, Climer |
2019-03-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2019-03-06 | House | Amended |
2019-03-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 47 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 47 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 47 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 47 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 47 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 47 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 47 | 75 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 47 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |