SC H3576 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establish The South Carolina Workforce Industry Needs Scholarship (sc Wins), To Provide That Certain Students Attending A Two-year Technical College Are Eligible For The Scholarship, And To Provide Eligibility Requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Workforce Industry Needs Scholarship (SC WINS), established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-01 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-31HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-01-31HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseAmended
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Moore, Clemmons, Jefferson
2019-01-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis
2019-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Garvin
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59150365(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback