SC H3568 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restructure The Penalties And Provide Graduated Penalties For Violations Of The Statutes
Title
Altering, tampering with, or bypassing electric, gas, or water meters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Act No. 23 | |
2013-05-13 | Effective date 05/03/13 | |
2013-05-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-05-02 | Ratified R 34 | |
2013-04-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2013-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2013-04-09 | House | Amended |
2013-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2013-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3408 (Similar To) 2013-01-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0274 (Similar To) 2013-04-24 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
S0274 (Similar To) 2013-04-24 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 13 | 385 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 7 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 7 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |