SC H3538 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 50-15-500, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Alligator Management Program, So As To Establish That The Department Of Natural Resources Must Set Conditions For The Humane Taking And Disposition Of Alligators; To Prohibit The Taking Of Alligators From A Sanctuary Unless The Alligator Has Been Determined To Be A Nuisance; To Require The Department To Establish Specific Methods Of Humane Capture, Removal, And Disposal Of Alligator Parts; And To Expand The Scope Of Actions Violating The Provisions Of This Section To Include The Inhumane Taking, Removing, And Disposition Of An Alligator Or Alligator Parts, And To Provide That The Official Citation Issued By Enforcement Officers May Be Used To Cite Violations Of This Section.
Title
Alligator Management Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-02-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Amended |
2022-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2022-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0185 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry