SC H3531 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Provision That Allows The Public Display, Showing, Or Exhibition Of Certain Wild Carnivores, Primates, Or Other Animals.
Title
Wild cats, Apes, and Bears
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 86 | |
2017-05-17 | Effective date See Act | |
2017-05-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-09 | Ratified R 57 | |
2017-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-6 |
2017-05-04 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-02-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-02-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-5 |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-02-01 | House | Amended |
2017-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin |
2017-01-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |