SC H3514 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, Willis
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Promulgate Regulations To Establish Maximum Contaminant Levels For Certain Pollutants In Public Water Systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contaminant levels

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, Willis
2021-03-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Henderson-Myers, Alexander
2021-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
2021-02-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins
2021-02-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox, B.Cox
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wetmore, Morgan
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0219 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
H3515 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback