SC H3509 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 8 To Chapter 7, Title 63 So As To Establish An Extended Foster Care Program And Related Procedures To Enable Certain Children In The Custody Of The Department Of Social Services On Their Eighteenth Birthday To Continue To Receive Services And Supports From The Department Until The Age Of Twenty-one; To Define Terms; To Provide For Voluntary And Court-ordered Extended Foster Care; To Require Case Review And Permanency Planning; And For Other Purposes; And To Amend Section 63-7-1700, Relating To Permanency Planning Hearings, So As To Make Conforming Changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child protection and permanency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseRecommitted to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-11
2021-02-23HouseRead second time
2021-02-23HouseAmended
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter, Oremus, Henegan, Jefferson, R.Williams
2021-02-18HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-01-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0221 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6371700(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback