SC H3500 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976 By Adding Chapter 57 To Title 46 So As To Define Certain Terms, Provide A Farm Equipment Manufacturer Shall Make Diagnostic And Repair Documentation Available To An Independent Repair Provider Or Owner Of Farm Equipment Manufactured By The Farm Equipment Manufacturer Under Certain Circumstances, Provide A Farm Equipment Manufacturer That Sells Farm Equipment That Contains A Security-related Function Shall Make Available To An Owner Or Independent Repair Provider Information Needed To Reset The Lock Or Function, Provide A Farm Equipment Manufacturer May Provide Information To Reset An Immobilizer System Or Security-related Electronic Module Through A Secure Data Release System, Provide A Provision In An Authorized Repair Agreement Purporting To Waive, Avoid, Or Limit A Farm Equipment Manufacturer's Compliance Is Void, And Provide A Penalty.
Title
Farm equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers |
2021-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3500&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3500_20201216.htm |