SC H3487 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein, Wetmore
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein, Wetmore
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 21 To Chapter 3, Title 16 So As To Enact The "sexual Assault Survivors' Bill Of Rights Act".
Title
Sexual Assault Survivors' Bill of Rights Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Jermaine Johnson [D] | Rep. Beth Bernstein [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Wetmore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein, Wetmore |
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0686 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Climer, McLeod, Adams, Garrett
H4157 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4157 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3487&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3487_20201216.htm |