SC H3481 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Suspend Section 1-11-705(i)(2) Of The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, For Fiscal Year 2020-2021 Relating To A Transfer Of Funds To The South Carolina Retiree Health Insurance Trust Fund. - Ratified Title
Title
Transfer of funds to SC Retiree Health Insurance Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 96 | |
2021-02-03 | Effective date 01/29/21 | |
2021-01-29 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-01-27 | Ratified R 1 | |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-0 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-01-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-01-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-01-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0 |
2021-01-14 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-14 | House | Amended |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0989 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H4815 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Act No. 243
H4815 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Act No. 243