SC H3479 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 12-6-3710 So As To Allow A Five Thousand Dollar Tax Credit To Any Taxpayer That Employs A Formerly Incarcerated Individual As A Full-time Employee For One Year, To Specify The Taxes For Which The Credit May Be Applied, And Specify Eligibility Requirements.
Title
Tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3348 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3479&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3479_20201216.htm |