SC H3471 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-20-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-20-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 48-43-400 So As To Provide That State Agencies Or Political Subdivisions May Not Approve Plans Or Ordinances That Would Deter, Prohibit, Or Impede The Construction Or Use Of Infrastructure Used To Facilitate Atlantic Ocean Marine Seismic Testing To Locate Reserves Of Oil And Natural Gas Or Facilitate The Transportation Or Storage Of Atlantic Ocean Offshore Oil Or Gas Onto The Land Or Waters Of This State.
Title
Offshore oil
Sponsors
Rep. James Burns [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] | Rep. Steven Long [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] |
Rep. William Hixon [R] | Rep. Patrick Haddon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-20-20 |
2020-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon |
2020-01-15 | House | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Hiott, Bryant, Forrest, Martin, Burns, Chumley, Haddon, Magnusson, DC Moss, and Bailey |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3470 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs