SC H3432 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Sections 16-11-440 And 16-11-450, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Both Relating To Immunity From Criminal Prosecution And Civil Actions Under Certain Circumstances For The Use Of Deadly Force Against Another Person (stand Your Ground), Both So As To Include Displaying Deadly Force In The Purview Of The Statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunity from prosecution and civil action for stand your ground

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1611440(n/a)See Bill Text
1611450(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback