SC H3392 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Oremus
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Oremus
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 12-36-60, 12-36-70, As Amended 12-36-90, As Amended 12-36-110, And 12-36-130, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, All Relating To Definitions For Purposes Of The Sales Tax, So As To Include The Sales Of Services; By Adding Section 12-36-160 So As To Define "services"; To Amend Section 12-36-910, Relating To The Five Percent State Sales Tax Rate, So As To Reduce The Sales Tax Rate To Three Percent; To Amend Section 12-36-920, Relating To The State Accommodations Tax, So As To Make A Conforming Change By Reducing The Rate; To Amend Section 12-36-940, Relating To Amounts That May Be Added To Sales Prices To Account For Tax, So As Authorize The Department To Make Adjustments; To Repeal Article 11 Of Chapter 36, Title 12, Relating To The Additional One Percent Sales And Use Tax; To Amend Sections 12-36-1310 And 12-36-1320, Both Relating To The Use Tax, So As To Make A Conforming Change By Reducing The Rate; To Amend Section 12-36-1710, Relating To The Casual Excise Tax, So As To Make A Conforming Change By Reducing The Rate; To Amend Section 12-36-2120, Relating To Sales Tax Exemptions, So As To Remove The Exemption On Certain Items; To Amend Section 12-36-2530, Relating To Taxes On Items Delivered Out Of State, So As To Make A Conforming Change; To Amend Sections 12-36-2620, 12-36-2630, And 12-36-2640, All Relating To The Crediting Of Certain Taxes, So As To Credit Such Taxes In The Same Proportion As They Were Credited Before The Rate Reduction; To Repeal Section 12-36-2646 Relating To The Tax Exclusion For Individuals At Least Eighty Five Years Of Age; By Adding Section 11-11-270 So As To Create The "tax Reform Reserve Fund" And To Specify Its Purpose; And By Adding Article 11 To Chapter 10, Title 4 So As To Proportionally Reduce Local Sales And Use Taxes In The Same Manner As The State Sales And Use Tax.
Title
Sales tax definitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Oremus |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0823 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 11 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 1320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 1710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2630 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2640 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 2646 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 36 | 940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3392&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3392_20201209.htm |