SC H3384 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 53-5-110 So As To Require School Districts To Be Closed On Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Martin Luther King, Jr. Day; require schools to be closed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
535110(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback