SC H3372 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 7-15-325 So As To Establish A Fourteen Day Period During Which All Qualified Electors Of This State Must Be Allowed To Cast An In-person Absentee Ballot Without Being Required To Assert, State, Offer, Or Provide An Excuse, Justification, Or Reason, And To Require That Each County Board Of Voter Registration And Elections Establish At Least One In-person Absentee Voting Location For Every Fifty Thousand Registered Voters Up To A Maximum Of Six In-person Absentee Voting Locations; To Amend Section 7-5-220, Relating To The Requirement That Registration Made Thirty Days Or Less Before An Election Is Not Valid For That Election, So As To Provide That Regardless Of The Method Of Registration, Any Registration Made Thirty Days Or Less Before Any Election Is Not Valid For That Election Or Any Second Race Or Runoff Resulting From That Election; To Amend Section 7-9-70, Relating To The Required Notices Of County Conventions, So As To Eliminate The Requirement That A County Committee Publish Certain Notices Regarding County Conventions In A Newspaper Having General Circulation In The County; To Amend Section 7-11-10, Relating To Methods Of Nominating Candidates, So As To Prohibit A Candidate From Filing More Than One Statement Of Intention Of Candidacy For A Single Election, And To Prohibit A Candidate From Being Nominated By More Than One Political Party For A Single Office In An Election; To Amend Section 7-11-15, As Amended, Relating To Qualifications To Run As A Candidate In General Elections, So As To Require All Candidates From Each Political Party In This State To Pay A Filing Fee, Including Candidates From Parties That Are Not Required To Conduct A Primary Election, And To Authorize Political Parties To Charge A Certification Fee To All Candidates Seeking Nomination By Political Party Primary Or Political Party Convention; To Amend Section 7-13-320, Relating To Ballots And Specifications, So As To Prohibit A Candidate's Name From Appearing On The Ballot More Than Once; To Amend Section 7-15-320, Relating To Persons Qualified To Vote By Absentee Ballot, So As To Remove Certain Categories Of Electors Who Are Qualified To Vote By Absentee Ballot; To Amend Section 7-15-420, As Amended, Relating To The Receipt, Tabulation, And Reporting Of Absentee Ballots, So As To Allow The Examination Of Absentee Ballot Return-addressed Envelopes To Begin At 8:30 A.m. On The Calendar Day Immediately Preceding Election Day, And To Allow The Tabulation Of Absentee Ballots To Begin At 7:00 A.m. On Election Day; To Amend Section 7-17-560, Relating To The Authority Of The State Executive Committees To Hear Certain Protests And Contests, So As To Require The State Executive Committees Also To Hear Protests And Contests In The Case Of County Officers And Less Than County Officers; And To Repeal Sections 7-17-520, 7-17-530, 7-17-540, And 7-17-550 Relating To Hearings By County Executive Committees And Appeals From Decisions Of County Executive Committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting and elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
71110(n/a)See Bill Text
71115(n/a)See Bill Text
713320(n/a)See Bill Text
715320(n/a)See Bill Text
715325(n/a)See Bill Text
715420(n/a)See Bill Text
717520(n/a)See Bill Text
717530(n/a)See Bill Text
717540(n/a)See Bill Text
717550(n/a)See Bill Text
717560(n/a)See Bill Text
75220(n/a)See Bill Text
7970(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback