SC H3369 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Repealing Section 20-1-300 Relating To The Issuance Of A Marriage License To Minors When The Female Is Pregnant Or Has Given Birth To A Child.
Title
License issuance to an unmarried female and male under 18 when the female is pregnant or had a child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-01-31 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-01-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2019-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler, Henderson-Myers |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Clary, Pope, Bryant, Fry |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2019-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0196 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Act No. 33